Global Patent Index - EP 1321912 A1

EP 1321912 A1 2003-06-25 - Electrical device for data transfer

Title (en)

Electrical device for data transfer

Title (de)

Elektrische Einrichtung zur Datenübertragung

Title (fr)

Dispositif électrique pour la transmission de données

Publication

EP 1321912 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130779 A

Priority

EP 01130779 A

Abstract (en)

Emitted pulsed light serves to transfer machine-readable data onto a reader device. The light is produced by an LED and may be modulated in order to transfer the data. Data is transferred onto the reader device through visible light that is emitted by a display light on an electrical device for displaying operating status. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a method for transmitting data between an electrical device and reading equipment.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Einrichtung insbesondere zur Steuerung eines Antriebes einer Arbeitsmaschine, welche eine Lichtquelle zum Emitieren von sichtbarem Licht zur Anzeige eines Betriebszustandes aufweist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass das emitierte Licht zusätzlich zur Übertragung von maschinenlesbaren Daten auf ein externes Lesegerät dient, sowie ein entsprechendes Verfahren zur Übertragung von Daten zwischen einer elektrischen Einrichtung und einem externen Lesegerät.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321912 A1 20030625; EP 1321912 B1 20081029; DE 50114450 D1 20081211

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090730

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114450 P 20081211

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-06-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRICAL DEVICE FOR DATA TRANSFER

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061005

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI