Global Patent Index - EP 1321915 A2

EP 1321915 A2 2003-06-25 - Apparatus to monitor traffic

Title (en)

Apparatus to monitor traffic

Title (de)

Verkehrsüberwachungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance du traffic

Publication

EP 1321915 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02027395 A

Priority

IT UD20010205 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus to monitor vehicle traffic in a road (15), comprising sensor means able to detect the presence of vehicles (14) passing along the road (15) and to emit corresponding transit signals. The sensor means are arranged at intervals along a carriageway of the road (15) and are connected to transceiver means (11) able to receive and process the transit signals in order to generate corresponding processed signals and to send them to at least a control unit (12), which is able to coordinate the transceiver means (11) and is connected to an operational center (13) which controls the traffic. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2013.01); G08G 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321915 A2 20030625; EP 1321915 A3 20031217; IT UD20010205 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PADULOSI, UGO

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/01 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/04 B

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PADULOSI, UGO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI