Global Patent Index - EP 1321954 A1

EP 1321954 A1 2003-06-25 - Switch unit and control lever with integrated switch unit

Title (en)

Switch unit and control lever with integrated switch unit

Title (de)

Schaltereinheit und Schalthebel mit Schaltereinheit

Title (fr)

Dispositif interrupteur électrique et levier de commande avec dispositif interrupteur électrique integré

Publication

EP 1321954 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023433 A

Priority

DE 10162764 A

Abstract (en)

The switch unit (12) has a base surface (14) supporting switch elements (22,23) operated by a switch slider (18), displaced parallel to the base surface. The switch elements are operated perpendicular to the base surface, via a pivot lever switch piece (24) acting between the switch slider and the switch elements. <??>An Independent claim for a switch lever for an automobile steering column switch is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schaltereinheit und einen Schalthebel mit einer Schaltereinheit, mit einer Schaltergrundfläche und mit auf der Schaltergrundfläche angeordneten Schaltelementen, die mittels einem weitgehend parallel zur Schaltergrundfläche verschiebbar angeordneten Schiebeelement schaltbar sind. Die Erfindung kennzeichnet sich dadurch, dass die Schaltelemente weitgehend senkrecht zur Schaltergrundfläche betätigbar sind und dass zwischen dem Schiebeelement und den Schaltelementen ein mit dem Schiebeelement und den Schaltelementen zusammenwirkendes kipphebelartiges Schaltstück angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/14; H01H 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 15/10 (2006.01); H01H 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 15/102 (2013.01); H01H 23/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321954 A1 20030625; EP 1321954 B1 20050316; DE 10162764 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202473 P 20050421

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI