Global Patent Index - EP 1322002 A2

EP 1322002 A2 2003-06-25 - Lamp holder

Title (en)

Lamp holder

Title (de)

Lampenfassung

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe

Publication

EP 1322002 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024078 A

Priority

DE 10163056 A

Abstract (en)

The bulb holder (10) comprises a cover element (12) which covers the lead entry openings, incorporates chambers for at least a part of the contacts, and is provided with a central opening (20) housing the sides (15) and the base (25) of the holding spring (16). The base (26) is provided at its ends with tabs (26) bearing against the bottom surface of the cover element.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben ist eine Lampenfassung, insbes. Fassung für Halogen-Hochvoltlampen, umfassend elektrische Kontakte sowie einen zur Aufnahme des Lampensockels bestimmten Fassungsstein aus Keramik oder Porzellan und eine den Fassungsstein leiteranschlussseitig im wesentlichen bis auf Leitereinführöffnungen verschließendende Abdeckung sowie eine im wesentlichen U-förmige, am Lampensockel angreifende Haltefeder, die einerseits mittels widerhakenartiger Rastzungen im Fassungsstein verankert ist und andererseits die Abdeckung am Fassungsstein hält. Erfindungsgemäß dass die Abdeckung Aufnahmekammern für zumindest Teile der Kontakte aufweist und mit einer zentralen bodenseitigen Öffnung zum Durchgriff der Schenkel der Haltefeder und zur Aufnahme des Steges der Haltefeder versehen ist und dass der Steg an seinen Enden mit nach auswärts gerichteten Lappen versehen ist, die sich unter der Abdeckung abstützen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/02; H01R 33/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 33/97 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/97 (2013.01); H01R 2201/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1322002 A2 20030625; EP 1322002 A3 20040121; EP 1322002 B1 20050427; CN 1187870 C 20050202; CN 1427513 A 20030702; DE 10163056 A1 20030710; DE 10163056 B4 20040708; ES 2240632 T3 20051016; JP 2003243114 A 20030829; JP 3978664 B2 20070919; TW 200301598 A 20030701; TW 578344 B 20040301; US 2003119376 A1 20030626; US 6692308 B2 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151030

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121029

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121029

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240632 T3

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 33/02 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 33/09 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI