Global Patent Index - EP 1322003 A2

EP 1322003 A2 2003-06-25 - High voltage lamp holder

Title (en)

High voltage lamp holder

Title (de)

Fassung für Hochvoltlampen

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe haute tension

Publication

EP 1322003 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024079 A

Priority

DE 10163057 A

Abstract (en)

A socket body (SB) (11) and a retaining sleeve (RS) (12) use coupling devices to plug into each other, which have a bayonet-locking design, a lifter/cam (17) in the RS pointing radially inwards and a shoulder (21) on the SB for the base (19) of the cam so that the SB and the RS couple up when pushed together and turned.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben ist eine Lampenfassung, insbes. Fassung für Halogen-Hochvoltlampen, umfassend einen zur Aufnahme des Lampensockels bestimmten Fassungsstein aus hochtemperaturbeständigem Isolierstoff mit darin angeordneten elektrischen Kontakten und eine den Fassungsstein zumindest teilweise umschließende Aufnahmehülse, wobei Fassungsstein und Aufnahmehülse über korrespondierende Kupplungsorgane miteinander steckverbindbar sind. Entsprechend der Erfindung sind die Kupplungsorgane nach Art einer Bajonettverriegelung ausgebildet und weisen wenigstens einen in der Aufnahmehülse ausgebildeten, radial einwärts gerichteten Nocken und am Fassungsstein eine Anlageschulter für die Unterfläche des Nockens auf, so dass nach axialem Zusammenfügen und einer relativen Umfangsdrehung Fassungsstein und Aufnahmehülse in Kupplungsstellung gelangen. Die Kupplungsstellung ist durch wenigstens eine formschlüssig wirkende Rückdrehsicherung verriegelbar, die bei der Umfangsdrehung selbsttätig in Wirkstellung gelangt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/02; H01R 33/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/09 (2006.01); H01R 33/46 (2006.01); H01R 33/88 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/09 (2013.01); H01R 2201/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1322003 A2 20030625; EP 1322003 A3 20040121; EP 1322003 B1 20051026; CN 1200487 C 20050504; CN 1427514 A 20030702; DE 10163057 A1 20030710; DE 10163057 B4 20040708; ES 2250569 T3 20060416; JP 2003242828 A 20030829; TW 200301599 A 20030701; TW 589768 B 20040601; US 2003119375 A1 20030626; US 6626707 B2 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141030

2015-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151126

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141029

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121029

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121029

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2250569 T3

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060111

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 33/02 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 33/09 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI