Global Patent Index - EP 1322004 A2

EP 1322004 A2 2003-06-25 - Lampholder in particular holder for high voltage halogen lamps

Title (en)

Lampholder in particular holder for high voltage halogen lamps

Title (de)

Lampenfassung, insbes. Fassung für Halogen-Hochvoltlampen

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe en particulier pour lampes halogènes à haute tension

Publication

EP 1322004 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024077 A

Priority

DE 10163055 A

Abstract (en)

The bulb holder (10) for high-voltage halogen bulbs comprises electric contacts (31), with each such contact consisting a base section (36) and at least one screw-less connector clamp with a clamping spring (38) and a bearing element (37) for each lead end (32). The bulb socket is provided with a blind hole (35) for each lead end and the respective bearing element.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben ist eine Lampenfassung, insbes. Fassung für Hochvoltlampen, umfassend elektrische Kontakte sowie einen zur Aufnahme des Lampensockels bestimmten Fassungsstein aus temperaturfestem Material wie Keramik, Porzellan od. dgl. und eine den Fassungsstein leiteranschlussseitig im wesentlichen bis auf Leitereinführöffnungen verschließendende Abdeckung sowie eine im wesentlichen U-förmige, am Lampensockel angreifende Haltefeder, die einerseits mittels widerhakenartiger Rastzungen im Fassungsstein verankert ist und andererseits die Abdeckung am Fassungsstein hält. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Lampenfassung dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass die Abdeckung ein äußerst maßhaltiger spritzgegossener Formkörper aus einem hochtemperaturbeständigen thermoplastischen Kunststoff wie PPS oder LCP ist mit Aufnahmekammern für zumindest Teile der Kontakte. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 33/09 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01); H01R 33/09 (2013.01); H01R 13/6275 (2013.01); H01R 2201/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1322004 A2 20030625; EP 1322004 A3 20040121; EP 1322004 B1 20051026; CN 1237671 C 20060118; CN 1431739 A 20030723; DE 10163055 A1 20030710; DE 10163055 B4 20040708; ES 2250568 T3 20060416; JP 2003234160 A 20030822; TW 200301500 A 20030701; TW I220763 B 20040901; US 2003119363 A1 20030626; US 6648691 B2 20031118

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151030

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121029

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121029

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2250568 T3

2005-12-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI