Global Patent Index - EP 1322055 A2

EP 1322055 A2 2003-06-25 - Audio mixer with built-in electronic metronome

Title (en)

Audio mixer with built-in electronic metronome

Title (de)

Tonmischer mit eingebautem elektronischen Metronom

Title (fr)

Mixeur audio avec métronome électronique intégré

Publication

EP 1322055 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425691 A

Priority

IT MC20010045 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an audio mixer with built-in electronic metronome, whose signal is sent directly to at least one of the adders located upstream all mixer outputs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 7/00; G04F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/04 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1322055 A2 20030625; EP 1322055 A3 20040811; IT MC20010045 U1 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070531

2005-05-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-03-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 7/00 A

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 04F 5/02 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI