Global Patent Index - EP 1322100 A2

EP 1322100 A2 2003-06-25 - Semiconductor device, portable remote terminal unit and intermittent receiving method

Title (en)

Semiconductor device, portable remote terminal unit and intermittent receiving method

Title (de)

Halbleiterbauteil, tragbares Endgerät und Intermittierendes Empfangsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif semiconducteur, terminal distant portable et méthode de réception intermittente

Publication

EP 1322100 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02255670 A

Priority

JP 2001384256 A

Abstract (en)

A semiconductor device is disclosed in which consumption of power attendant on a leakage current in a block (2) where the power is turned on and off intermittently is reduced. In the semiconductor device according to the present invention, an error check necessity judgment circuit (4) judges on notification from an error check necessity notification circuit (6) located in a block (2) where the power is not disconnected whether an error check must be made, and an error check execution circuit (5) makes an error check on data loaded from an external memory at the time of a boot in accordance with the judgment of the error check necessity judgment circuit (4). An error check cannot completely be omitted. Therefore, to ensure the reliability of a system, an error check is forcedly made once whenever a boot is performed a number of times set by an error check interval setting circuit (7). This shortens intermittent operation time by time taken to make an error check, resulting in a reduction in consumption of power attendant on a useless leakage current. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/73; H04B 1/16; G06F 9/445; H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/40 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04M 1/73 (2006.01); H04W 52/02 (2009.01); H04W 88/02 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/0229 (2013.01); Y02D 70/24 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1322100 A2 20030625; EP 1322100 A3 20040506; EP 1322100 B1 20061018; CN 1194379 C 20050323; CN 1427448 A 20030702; DE 60215445 D1 20061130; DE 60215445 T2 20070201; JP 2003188798 A 20030704; JP 4162401 B2 20081008; KR 100838008 B1 20080612; KR 20030051179 A 20030625; TW 556419 B 20031001; US 2003115507 A1 20030619; US 7007202 B2 20060228

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SOCIONEXT INC., YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FUJITSU SEMICONDUCTOR LTD., YOKOHAMA, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 60215445

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60215445

- Representative's name: REICHERT & LINDNER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-05-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60215445

- Representative's name: REICHERT & LINDNER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100814

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-01-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60215445 P 20061130

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/73 A

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/16 B

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 9/445 B

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 7/32 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI