Global Patent Index - EP 1322137 A2

EP 1322137 A2 2003-06-25 - Portable speaker systems and applications thereof

Title (en)

Portable speaker systems and applications thereof

Title (de)

Tragbares Lautsprechersystem und Verwendungen davon

Title (fr)

Système de haut-paleur portable et applications du même

Publication

EP 1322137 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02257673 A

Priority

  • GB 0126601 A
  • GB 0126602 A
  • GB 0126603 A

Abstract (en)

An exciter capsule comprises an electromagnetic transducer (8) housed in a housing (12) and has means for electrically connecting to the audio output of an audio device, such as a mobile telephone. The capsule is mountable on a variety of resonant surfaces to provide a portable speaker system which may be used with portable audio devices, for example as part of a hands-free mobile telephone kit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/10; H04R 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/10 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01); H04R 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/066 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1322137 A2 20030625; EP 1322137 A3 20080827

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1058607

2009-08-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-06-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2008-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2008-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 9/10 20060101AFI20030429BHEP

2008-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 1/02 20060101ALI20080428BHEP

2008-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 7/04 20060101ALI20080428BHEP

2004-05-21 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1058607

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI