Global Patent Index - EP 1323545 B1

EP 1323545 B1 2009-02-18 - Binder

Title (en)

Binder

Title (de)

Ordner

Title (fr)

Classeur

Publication

EP 1323545 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02026955 A

Priority

  • JP 2001397572 A
  • JP 2002254580 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1323545A2] Two first binding members supported rotatably by a base (18), which will be fixed to a back cover (11), and two second binding members (20,20), which engage with the front ends of the first binding members (19,19) to form closed loops, are provided. Spaces between the base sections of the first and second binding members (20,20,19,19) are connected via a first and second connecting plate, respectively. A releasing means is disposed between the respective connecting members, and a force is given by the releasing means in the direction that the closed loops via binding members (20,20,19,19) are released. It is such adapted that, when the first binding members (19,19) are nipped by fingertips and given an operation force in the direction that the same come closer to each other, the engagement with the second members (20,20) are released and the front ends can rotate in the direction that the same are opened. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/22 (2006.01); B42F 13/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1323545 A2 20030702; EP 1323545 A3 20040811; EP 1323545 B1 20090218; AT 423018 T 20090315; CN 1206115 C 20050615; CN 1428253 A 20030709; DE 60231184 D1 20090402; JP 2003251973 A 20030909; JP 3821763 B2 20060913; KR 20030057292 A 20030704; TW 564224 B 20031201; US 2003123923 A1 20030703; US 7223040 B2 20070529

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60231184 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070831

2005-08-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2005-05-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO