Global Patent Index - EP 1324320 B8

EP 1324320 B8 2009-02-18 - OPTICAL DISC MEDIUM, OPTICAL DISC PLAYBACK AND RECORDER

Title (en)

OPTICAL DISC MEDIUM, OPTICAL DISC PLAYBACK AND RECORDER

Title (de)

OPTISCHES PLATTENMEDIUM, WIEDERGABE DER OPTISCHEN PLATTE UND AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISQUE OPTIQUE, LECTURE ET ENREGISTREMENT DE DISQUE OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 1324320 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 01961226 A

Priority

  • JP 0107502 W
  • JP 2000264978 A
  • JP 2000275988 A
  • JP 2000397621 A
  • JP 2001077897 A
  • JP 2001185729 A
  • JP 2001196258 A
  • JP 2001212071 A
  • JP 2001219292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002145947A1] On an optical disk medium according to the present invention, address information is recorded along a wobbling track groove 2. The track groove 2 is made up of a plurality of unit sections 22, 23. Each of these unit sections 22, 23 has side faces that are displaced periodically in a disk radial direction. This displacement oscillates at a single period in a tracking direction. However, the displacement pattern differs depending on "each bit of address information (subdivided information)" allocated to each of the unit sections 22, 23.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/004 (2006.01); G11B 7/0045 (2006.01); G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/24082 (2013.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01); G11B 27/19 (2006.01); G11B 27/24 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01); G11B 7/005 (2006.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/3027 (2013.01); G11B 7/007 (2013.01); G11B 7/00745 (2013.01); G11B 7/24082 (2013.01); G11B 20/00405 (2013.01); G11B 20/00492 (2013.01); G11B 20/10009 (2013.01); G11B 20/1217 (2013.01); G11B 20/1833 (2013.01); G11B 27/19 (2013.01); G11B 27/24 (2013.01); G11B 7/0053 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1221 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1239 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1265 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1268 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1274 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1287 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1292 (2013.01); G11B 2020/1298 (2013.01); G11B 2220/216 (2013.01); G11B 2220/218 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2537 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2541 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2002145947 A1 20021010; US 7027374 B2 20060411; AU 2001282561 B2 20060720; AU 8256101 A 20020322; BR 0113613 A 20030701; CA 2424008 A1 20030226; CN 1296906 C 20070124; CN 1451160 A 20031022; CN 1534625 A 20041006; CN 1534625 B 20100421; DE 60136553 D1 20081224; EP 1324320 A1 20030702; EP 1324320 A4 20041027; EP 1324320 B1 20081112; EP 1324320 B8 20090218; EP 2031586 A2 20090304; EP 2031586 A3 20110629; EP 2315207 A2 20110427; EP 2315207 A3 20110525; EP 2315208 A2 20110427; EP 2315208 A3 20110525; EP 2315208 B1 20130717; EP 2315209 A2 20110427; EP 2315209 A3 20110525; HU 0600588 A2 20061228; HU 229297 B1 20131028; JP WO2002021518 A1 20040115; KR 100796049 B1 20080121; KR 100798201 B1 20080124; KR 20030046422 A 20030612; KR 20070087149 A 20070827; MX PA03001650 A 20030624; PL 361222 A1 20040920; SK 287990 B6 20120903; SK 3922003 A3 20031104; US 2002141317 A1 20021003; US 2002163866 A1 20021107; US 2003007432 A1 20030109; US 2003043718 A1 20030306; US 2003223347 A1 20031204; US 2004047251 A1 20040311; US 2007081432 A1 20070412; US 2009086589 A1 20090402; US 2009086614 A1 20090402; US 6577590 B2 20030610; US 6608810 B2 20030819; US 6674700 B2 20040106; US 6757239 B2 20040629; US 7075883 B2 20060711; US 7145843 B2 20061205; US 7529167 B2 20090505; US 7826314 B2 20101102; US 8050172 B2 20111101; WO 0221518 A1 20020314

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-01-05 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136553 P 20081224

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050708

2004-10-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MINAMINO, JUNICHI

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAKAMURA, ATSUSHI

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FURUMIYA, SHIGERU

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHIBASHI, HIROMICHI

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHIDA, TAKASHI

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUSHIMA, TOYOJI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI