Global Patent Index - EP 1324763 A4

EP 1324763 A4 2007-10-31 - STAT3 AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF

Title (en)

STAT3 AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF

Title (de)

STAT3-AGONISTEN UND ANTAGONISTEN UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHEN ANWENDUNGSZWECKE

Title (fr)

AGONISTES ET ANTAGONISTES DE STAT3 ET APPLICATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES DE CEUX-CI

Publication

EP 1324763 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01970740 A

Priority

  • US 0128254 W
  • US 23121200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220032A1] The present invention relates to methods of modulating, i.e., agonizing or antagonizing, Stat3 (Signal Transducer and Activator of Transcription3) signaling activity for use in gene therapy. Inhibition and/or activation of Stat3 signaling is an effective approach to modulate angiogenesis and the immune response for treatment and/or prevention of inflammation, infection, inflammation, immune disorders, and ischemia.

[origin: WO0220032A1] The present invention relates to methods of modulating, <i>i.e.</i>, agonizing or antagonizing, Stat3 (Signal Transducer and Activator of Transcription3) signaling activity for use in gene therapy. Inhibition and/or activation of Stat3 signaling is an effective approach to modulate angiogenesis and the immune response for treatment and/or prevention of inflammation, infection, inflammation, immune disorders, and ischemia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 31/70; A61K 39/395; A61K 45/00; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/20 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/5005 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); A61K 38/204 (2013.01); C07K 14/4705 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 0044774 A2 20000803 - UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US]
  • [PX] YAMAUCHI-TAKIHARA, K. & KISHIMOTO, T.: "A novel role for STAT3 in cardiac remodeling", TRENDS IN ARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, vol. 10, no. 7, October 2000 (2000-10-01), pages 298 - 303, XP002448914
  • [X] NEGORO, S. ET AL.: "Activation of JAK/STAT pathway transduces cytoprotective signal in rat acute myocardial infarction", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, vol. 47, 6 September 2000 (2000-09-06), pages 797 - 805, XP002448915
  • [PX] NEGORO, S. ET AL.: "Activation of signal transducer and activator of transcription 3 protects cardiomyocytes from hypoxia/reoxigenation-induced oxidative stress through the upregulation of manganese superoxide dismutase", CIRCULATION, vol. 104, 28 August 2001 (2001-08-28), pages 979 - 981, XP002448916
  • See also references of WO 0220032A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220032 A1 20020314; WO 0220032 A9 20030320; CA 2421723 A1 20020314; EP 1324763 A1 20030709; EP 1324763 A4 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1057172

2011-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110217

2008-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081020

2007-10-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071001

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHN HOPKINS UNIVERSITY

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR