Global Patent Index - EP 1326749 B1

EP 1326749 B1 2009-02-25 - SHEET-FED PRINTING PRESS AND METHOD CARRIED OUT USING THE SAME

Title (en)

SHEET-FED PRINTING PRESS AND METHOD CARRIED OUT USING THE SAME

Title (de)

BOGENDRUCKMASCHINE UND VON DER MASCHINE UMGESETZTES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'IMPRESSION DE FEUILLES ET PROCEDE MIS EN OEUVRE PAR LA MACHINE

Publication

EP 1326749 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974614 A

Priority

  • CH 20592000 A
  • IB 0101951 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0232669A2] The printing press has at least one feed (31) for unprinted sheets (32), a plate cylinder (35) with at least one printing plate, a printing cylinder (36), a wiping device (49) and an inking system (37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45) for inking the necessary areas of a plate or plates carried by the plate cylinder (35). For a printing cylinder (36) that can carry N sheets on its periphery, N being a multiple of 2, the plate cylinder (35) comprises N/2 plates, so that half of the sheets (32) carried by the printing cylinder (36) are printed by each of the plates during a full rotation of the cylinders (35, 36).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 11/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/26 (2006.01); B65H 31/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/26 (2013.01); B41F 11/02 (2013.01); B65H 31/24 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1827 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0232669 A2 20020425; WO 0232669 A3 20020725; WO 0232669 A8 20040311; AT 423677 T 20090315; AU 777495 B2 20041021; AU 9412701 A 20020429; CA 2393209 A1 20020425; CA 2393209 C 20090929; CN 1265963 C 20060726; CN 1422213 A 20030604; DE 50114732 D1 20090409; EP 1326749 A2 20030716; EP 1326749 B1 20090225; JP 2004511365 A 20040415; JP 2008201144 A 20080904; KR 100829530 B1 20080520; KR 20070086581 A 20070827; RU 2262447 C2 20051020; UA 72952 C2 20030715; US 2003089253 A1 20030515; US 2004182264 A1 20040923; US 6761110 B2 20040713; US 6948428 B2 20050927

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-09-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114732

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091018

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091018

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-NOTASYS SA#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#4, RUE DE LA PAIX#1003 LAUSANNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2010-03-05 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-12-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-09-16 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114732 P 20090409

2009-04-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-02-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUENNINGER, BRIGITTE

2009-02-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUENNINGER, REINHOLD

2009-02-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STARK, SIEGFRIED, ALFONS

2008-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUENNINGER, BRIGITTE

2008-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUENNINGER, REINHOLD

2008-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STARK, SIEGFRIED, ALFONS

2007-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070911

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021030

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI