Global Patent Index - EP 1328383 B1

EP 1328383 B1 2009-02-11 - DOSING HOPPER

Title (en)

DOSING HOPPER

Title (de)

DOSIERBUNKER

Title (fr)

TREMIE DOSEUSE

Publication

EP 1328383 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01986632 A

Priority

  • DE 10050433 A
  • EP 0111815 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10050433A1] The dosing bunker has a feeder station (2) to distribute a flow of adhesive-coated timber particles continuously across the width of the bunker. The bunker is arranged for strands for the production of orientated particle board for the construction industry. The feeder station has a scales device (23) for weight-dependent distribution of the strands. It also has a pivot conveyor (4) or a parallel conveyor, connected to the scales unit. The pivot conveyor may be formed as dosing band scales.

[origin: DE10050433A1] The dosing bunker has a feeder station (2) to distribute a flow of adhesive-coated timber particles continuously across the width of the bunker. The bunker is arranged for strands for the production of orientated particle board for the construction industry. The feeder station has a scales device (23) for weight-dependent distribution of the strands. It also has a pivot conveyor (4) or a parallel conveyor, connected to the scales unit. The pivot conveyor may be formed as dosing band scales.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/14 (2006.01); B27N 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10050433 A1 20020418; CA 2425629 A1 20030414; DE 50114704 D1 20090326; EP 1328383 A1 20030723; EP 1328383 B1 20090211; US 2004043095 A1 20040304; US 7278551 B2 20071009; WO 0230639 A1 20020418

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114704

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH + CO. KG, 75031 EPPINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50114704

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-04-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50114704

- Representative's name: HARTDEGEN, ANTON, DIPL.-ING.(FH), DE

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-03-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50114704

- Representative's name: ANTON HARTDEGEN, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114704 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2008-05-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FI IT LI SE

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR