Global Patent Index - EP 1330846 A4

EP 1330846 A4 2004-12-15 - ELECTRODE AND ELECTRON EMISSION APPLICATIONS FOR N-TYPE DOPED NANOCRYSTALLINE MATERIALS

Title (en)

ELECTRODE AND ELECTRON EMISSION APPLICATIONS FOR N-TYPE DOPED NANOCRYSTALLINE MATERIALS

Title (de)

ELEKTRODE UND ELEKTRONENEMISSIONSVERWENDUNGEN FÜR N-DOTIERTE NANOKRISTALLINE MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

ELECTRODE ET APPLICATIONS D'EMISSION D'ELECTRONS POUR DES MATIERES NANOCRISTALLINES DOPEES DE TYPE N

Publication

EP 1330846 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01979558 A

Priority

  • US 0131388 W
  • US 23917300 P
  • US 31414201 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0231839A1] An electrically conducting n-type ultrananocrystalline diamond (UNCD) having no less than 10<19> atoms/cm<3> of nitrogen is disclosed. A method of making the n-doped UNCD. A method for predictably controlling the conductivity is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 31/0312; H01B 1/04; B01J 3/06; H01L 31/0368

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B82B 1/00 (2006.01); B01J 3/06 (2006.01); C01B 31/06 (2006.01); C23C 16/27 (2006.01); C30B 25/10 (2006.01); H01B 1/04 (2006.01); H01J 1/30 (2006.01); H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01); H01J 35/06 (2006.01); H01J 37/073 (2006.01); H01M 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/274 (2013.01); B01J 3/067 (2013.01); C01B 32/25 (2017.08); C23C 16/277 (2013.01); C23C 16/278 (2013.01); C23C 16/279 (2013.01); C30B 25/105 (2013.01); C30B 29/605 (2013.01); H01B 1/04 (2013.01); H01J 1/30 (2013.01); B01J 2203/0655 (2013.01); H01J 2201/30457 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C30B 25/105 + C30B 29/605
  2. C30B 25/105 + C30B 29/04

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0231839 A1 20020418; WO 0231839 A9 20030220; AU 1150502 A 20020422; AU 1155502 A 20020422; EP 1330846 A1 20030730; EP 1330846 A4 20041215; JP 2004511885 A 20040415; WO 0231891 A1 20020418; WO 0231891 A9 20030717

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091023

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050719

2004-12-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01L 31/0312 A

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01B 1/04 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 3/06 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01L 31/0368 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01L 31/0312 A

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAUSS, ALAN, R. DI

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRUEN, DIETER, M.

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AUCIELLO, ORLANDO, H.

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CARLISLE, JOHN, A.

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SWAIN, GREG M.,DPT. OF CHEMISTRY AND BIOCHEMISTRY

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DING, MING

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 3/06 A

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI