Global Patent Index - EP 1330965 B1

EP 1330965 B1 2009-02-18 - Snowboard boot

Title (en)

Snowboard boot

Title (de)

Snowboardstiefel

Title (fr)

Chaussure pour la pratique du surf des neiges

Publication

EP 1330965 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356256 A

Priority

FR 0201014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1330965A1] The boot, comprising a supple upper with a detachable inner liner, has the sole (6) of the liner made with a zone (8) of lower compressibility along the middle to facilitate pivoting movements of the foot about its lengthwise axis and relative to the boot sole (3). The different degrees of flexibility are produced e.g. by using different plastic materials assembled by overmoulding, adhesion or thermo-compression. In a variant of the design the zone of reduced compressibility can be along the centre of an insole rather than the liner, and it can have transverse grooves at its forward end to allow it to bend for walking.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01); A43B 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 5/0441 (2013.01); A43B 13/141 (2013.01); A43B 13/188 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0743023 A1 19961120 - SALOMON SA [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1330965 A1 20030730; EP 1330965 B1 20090218; DE 60231188 D1 20090402; FR 2835155 A1 20030801; FR 2835155 B1 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60231188

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60231188 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051208

2006-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKIS ROSSIGNOL

2004-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO