Global Patent Index - EP 1331402 B1

EP 1331402 B1 2007-10-31 - Stator blade control apparatus

Title (en)

Stator blade control apparatus

Title (de)

Steuereinrichtung für Statorschaufel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'aube variable

Publication

EP 1331402 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 03290058 A

Priority

FR 0201022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1331402A1] The control mechanism, comprising a lever (30) with a coupling member (24) at its first end (32) to engage with a control ring, has the second end (34) of the lever connected to a radial slot (16) in a blade pivot. The slot has at least one edge (16a) inclined relative to its lengthwise median plane and co-operating with a matching inclined edge (34a) on the second end of the lever. The mechanism has a locking cap (44) applied to the second end of the lever, having an inner surface (48a) that ensures a flat contact with the outer surface of the second end of the lever and ensures its clearance-free contact with the inclined edges of the pivot.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/56 (2006.01); F01D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/16 (2013.01); F01D 17/162 (2013.01); F04D 29/563 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32073 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32172 (2013.01); Y10T 403/50 (2013.01); Y10T 403/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1331402 A1 20030730; EP 1331402 B1 20071031; CA 2418233 A1 20030729; CA 2418233 C 20110531; DE 60317119 D1 20071213; DE 60317119 T2 20080807; ES 2292916 T3 20080316; FR 2835294 A1 20030801; FR 2835294 B1 20040416; JP 2003227494 A 20030815; JP 4073794 B2 20080409; RU 2295655 C2 20070320; UA 79734 C2 20070725; US 2003143066 A1 20030731; US 6796767 B2 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140111

2015-03-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150331

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292916 T3

2008-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080110

2008-02-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60317119 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA

2004-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030117

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO