Global Patent Index - EP 1332811 B1

EP 1332811 B1 2007-10-24 - Mould pipe

Title (en)

Mould pipe

Title (de)

Kokillenrohr

Title (fr)

Tube pour lingotière

Publication

EP 1332811 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03000356 A

Priority

DE 10203967 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2415517A1] A chill tube (1) having a double T-shaped inner and outer cross section in beam blank format is encased in a water-guiding jacket (12) adapted to its outer contour while forming a water gap (14). The wall thickness (D) of chill tube (1) in the rounded transition regions (2) from middle crosspieces (4), which fac e each other head to head and are drawn in towards longitudinal axis (3), to t he neighboring crosswise positioned flanges (5) is dimensioned at least partial ly smaller than in the remaining wall sections (6, 7). The reduction in wall thickness is implemented by longitudinal hollow recesses (8). These recesses (8) extend only in the height range of the bath level. Into the cross sectional regions which are formed by the outer contour of chill tube (1) as well as t he inner contour of water-guiding jacket (12), filler pieces (17) are incorporated, adapted to this cross section,

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20219419 U1 20030403; AT 376465 T 20071115; BR 0300258 A 20030909; CA 2415517 A1 20030731; CA 2415517 C 20100223; CN 1248802 C 20060405; CN 1436622 A 20030820; DE 10203967 A1 20030814; DE 50308443 D1 20071206; DK 1332811 T3 20080218; EP 1332811 A2 20030806; EP 1332811 A3 20030820; EP 1332811 B1 20071024; ES 2291549 T3 20080301; JP 2003225741 A 20030812; KR 20030065403 A 20030806; MX PA03000876 A 20050214; PT 1332811 E 20071113; RU 2304485 C2 20070820; TW 200302758 A 20030816; TW I259114 B 20060801; US 2003141430 A1 20030731; US 2005028960 A1 20050210; US 7198092 B2 20070403

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2018-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170710

2017-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170110

2017-10-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170811

2017-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-10-03 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 3106

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-09-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-08-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-01-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-04-29 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Document: AT 376465 T

- Effective date: 20140219

2013-11-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20131004

2013-09-04 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-09-04 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: KME GERMANY G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130829

2013-08-27 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KME GERMANY AG & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KME GERMANY AG, DE

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KME GERMANY AG & CO. KG, 49074 OSNABRUECK, DE

- Document: DE 50308443

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50308443

- Representative's name: PIETRZYKOWSKI, ANJA, DE

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50308443

- Representative's name: PIETRZYKOWSKI, ANJA, DE

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2010-07-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080425

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080109

2010-05-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2008-08-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-05-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-05-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2291549 T3

2008-02-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070403867

2008-01-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50308443 P 20071206

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-11-13 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20071026

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KME GERMANY AG

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 11/041 A

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 11/04 B

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO