Global Patent Index - EP 1333115 B1

EP 1333115 B1 2007-10-24 - A tension-sensing device for the thread of weft feeders in textile machines

Title (en)

A tension-sensing device for the thread of weft feeders in textile machines

Title (de)

Fadenspannungserfassungsvorrichtung für den Faden einer Fadenliefervorrichtung in Textilmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection de tension pour le fil d'un fournisseur de trame dans une machine textile

Publication

EP 1333115 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03001430 A

Priority

IT TO20020089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1333115A2] A device for sensing the mechanical tension of the thread (F) and for converting it into electrical signals for driving modulated braking means (17) in weft feeders (10) for textile machines comprises a thread-guiding bush (19) crossed by the thread that unwinds from the drum (11) of the feeder (10) and means (24-25) for sensing and converting the mechanical tension that the thread transmits to the bush. According to the invention, the thread-guiding bush (19) is rigidly coupled to one of the rigid elements of a suspension frame (20) so as to be an integral part thereof, and the frame comprises at least two rigid frame elements (19a-21) and at least two elastically deformable elements (22-23), which are mutually and rigidly connected to each other according to a configuration shaped substantially like an elastically deformable quadrilateral. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 59/26 (2006.01); B65H 59/40 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); B65H 59/40 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01); D03D 47/366 (2013.01); B65H 2553/212 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1333115 A2 20030806; EP 1333115 A3 20040102; EP 1333115 B1 20071024; DE 60316999 D1 20071206; DE 60316999 T2 20080731; IT TO20020089 A1 20030801; IT TO20020089 D0 20020201

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60316999 P 20071206

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2007-10-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040226

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 03D 47/34 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 59/26 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 51/22 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 59/40 B

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO