Global Patent Index - EP 1333452 B1

EP 1333452 B1 2009-02-25 - Control device for an engine for operating an actuator

Title (en)

Control device for an engine for operating an actuator

Title (de)

Steuereinrichtung für einen Motor zur Verstellung eines Stellorgans

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'un moteur pour régler un actionneur

Publication

EP 1333452 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02028440 A

Priority

DE 10204199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1333452A2] The control arrangement includes a Hall switch (2) from which a signal is generated. The signal presets a moving direction of a motor (5) by providing the signal to a logical circuit (3). The logical circuit is connected to a bridge end circuit (4). The signal is compared with an actuating signal provided at the other end of the logical circuit. A drive signal for the motor is output at the bridge end circuit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2013.01); Y10T 137/8242 (2015.04)

Citation (examination)

DE 3726885 A1 19890223 - SIEMENS AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1333452 A2 20030806; EP 1333452 A3 20060308; EP 1333452 B1 20090225; BR 0300157 A 20040323; DE 10204199 A1 20030807; DE 50213312 D1 20090409; ES 2319872 T3 20090514; US 2003146721 A1 20030807; US 6924609 B2 20050802

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091220

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091220

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2011-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110329

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091219

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-05-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2319872 T3

2009-04-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213312 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021219

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO