Global Patent Index - EP 1335124 B1

EP 1335124 B1 2004-12-29 - Air filter for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Air filter for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Luftfilter für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Filtre à air pour un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1335124 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03001407 A

Priority

  • DE 10205416 A
  • DE 10213604 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1335124A1] Air filter (10) for an internal combustion engine comprises an air filter housing (12) having housing walls (24) surrounding a filter chamber containing a filter element (18), and an inlet (14) and an outlet (16). Openings (26) in at least one housing wall of the air filter housing can be closed depending on the operating state of the engine, and vice versa. Preferred Features: A plate element (28) provided with openings (30) and guided in the air filter housing is arranged in the air filter housing so that it moves toward the housing wall provided with the openings (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/02 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/14 (2006.01); G10K 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/22 (2013.01); F02M 35/02 (2013.01); F02M 35/10013 (2013.01); F02M 35/1294 (2013.01); F02M 35/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1335124 A1 20030813; EP 1335124 B1 20041229; US 2003172812 A1 20030918; US 6824591 B2 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120122

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110202

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090122

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50300213 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO