Global Patent Index - EP 1335655 A4

EP 1335655 A4 2004-12-08 - APPLICATOR BRUSHES AND METHOD FOR APPLYING MASCARA

Title (en)

APPLICATOR BRUSHES AND METHOD FOR APPLYING MASCARA

Title (de)

APPLIKATOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON WIMPERNTUSCHE

Title (fr)

BROSSES A APPLICATEUR ET TECHNIQUE D'APPLICATION DE MASCARA

Publication

EP 1335655 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01997237 A

Priority

  • US 0143414 W
  • US 25255900 P
  • US 28347501 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0241726A2] A brush for applying mascara to eyelashes includes bristles constructed of a polyamide fiber having an external surface modified to include a texturized surface configuration having a multiplicity of spaced apart indents. The bristles have a diameter of about 2.5. to 3.5 mils and are arranged in a spiral having plural turns, with more than 60 and up to about 120 bristles within each turn of the spiral arrangement. A method utilizes the improved brush to facilitate the application of mascaras in a wider range of viscosities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26; A46B 3/16; D02G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/26 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/265 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A45D 40/262 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0241726A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0241726 A2 20020530; WO 0241726 A3 20020912; AU 1668002 A 20020603; EP 1335655 A2 20030820; EP 1335655 A4 20041208

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050604

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI