Global Patent Index - EP 1336697 B1

EP 1336697 B1 2009-02-25 - Angle joint system connecting a strut to two struts connected at an angle, as well as a corner piece designed to that end

Title (en)

Angle joint system connecting a strut to two struts connected at an angle, as well as a corner piece designed to that end

Title (de)

Eckenverbindersystem zum Befestigen einer Strebe an zwei winklig miteinander verbundenen Profilschienen sowie ein Eckstück zur Anwendung zu diesem Zweck

Title (fr)

Système de joint d'angle pour la connexion d'une entretoise à deux profilés se raccordant sous un angle ainsi qu'une pièce d'angle aux fins de ce système

Publication

EP 1336697 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03075443 A

Priority

BE 200200102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1336697A1] The present invention concerns an angle joint system connecting a cam or bottom strut (3) to two upper edge struts (4) connected at an angle, and having a corner piece (1) that is fixed to the upper edge struts (4) and a fastening piece (2) which fixes the cam or bottom strut (3) to the corner piece (1), characterised in that the corner piece (1) has a base part (6) as well as flanges (8) which are hinge-mounted to this base part (6) on both side edges which, on the inner side of the angle, stand at right angles to both the upper edge struts (4) and are fixed to these upper edge struts (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/08 (2006.01); E04B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E04B 2007/066 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0881 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1336697 A1 20030820; EP 1336697 B1 20090225; BE 1014968 A3 20040706; DE 60326290 D1 20090409

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100214

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326290 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080123

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO