Global Patent Index - EP 1337139 A4

EP 1337139 A4 2004-12-29 - ALTERATION OF PLANT NITRATE AND OXALIC ACID CONCENTRATION

Title (en)

ALTERATION OF PLANT NITRATE AND OXALIC ACID CONCENTRATION

Title (de)

VERÄNDERUNG DES NITRAT- UND OXALSÄUREGEHALTS BEI PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

MODIFICATION DE LA TENEUR EN NITRATE ET EN ACIDE OXALIQUE D'UNE PLANTE

Publication

EP 1337139 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01979515 A

Priority

  • US 0131254 W
  • US 24405000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0234755A2] The present invention provides methods for altering the concentration or level of nitrate, soluble oxalic acid or oxalate, or nutritional quality indicators in a plant, comprising growing the plant in a hydroponic nutrient medium which contains a nitrogen source, and then alterning the content of the hydroponic medium prior to harvest of the plant so that the medium does not contain a nitrogen source, so that the concentration of oxalic acid or oxalage in the plant is altered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01G 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01G 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0698345 A1 19960228 - COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO KK [JP], et al
  • [XY] MOZAFAR A: "Decreasing the NO-3 and increasing the vitamin C contents in spinach by a nitrogen deprivation method", PLANT FOODS FOR HUMAN NUTRITION (DORDRECHT), vol. 49, no. 2, 1996, pages 155 - 162, XP009038827, ISSN: 0921-9668
  • [X] WANG XIU FENG ET AL: "Effect of lowering nitrate nitrogen and elevating potassium concentrations in the nutrient solution on the growth, yield, and NO3 content in spinach grown in hydroponics", JOURNAL OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, vol. 67, no. 1, January 1998 (1998-01-01), pages 74 - 80, XP009038826, ISSN: 0013-7626
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8815, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A01, Page 003, AN 1988-104173, XP002302910
  • [XY] OMBODI ATTILA ET AL: "Effects of polyolefin-coated fertilizer on nutritional quality of spinach plants", JOURNAL OF PLANT NUTRITION, vol. 23, no. 10, October 2000 (2000-10-01), pages 1495 - 1504, XP009038865, ISSN: 0190-4167
  • [XY] BAKR A A ET AL: "Trials to reduce nitrate and oxalate content in some leafy vegetables. 2. Interactive effects of the manipulating of the soil nutrient supply, different blanching media and preservation methods followed by cooking process", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, vol. 73, no. 2, 1997, pages 169 - 178, XP002302909, ISSN: 0022-5142
  • See also references of WO 0234755A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0234755 A2 20020502; WO 0234755 A3 20020919; AU 1146502 A 20020506; CA 2425687 A1 20020502; EP 1337139 A2 20030827; EP 1337139 A4 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071220

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060728

2005-08-31 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC.

2004-12-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI