Global Patent Index - EP 1338657 B9

EP 1338657 B9 2007-10-10 - Sequences specifcally deleted from Mycobacterium tuberculosis genome and their use in diagnosistics and as vaccines

Title (en)

Sequences specifcally deleted from Mycobacterium tuberculosis genome and their use in diagnosistics and as vaccines

Title (de)

Spezifisch vom Genom von Mycobacterium tuberculosis deletierte Sequenzen und deren Verwendung in der Diagnostik und als Vakzine

Title (fr)

Séquences spécifiquement délétées du génome de Mycobacterium tuberculosis et leur utilisation dans des diagnostics et comme vaccins

Publication

EP 1338657 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 02290458 A

Priority

EP 02290458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1338657A1] The present invention is the identification of a nucleotide sequence which make it possible in particular to distinguish an infection resulting from Mycobacterium tuberculosis from an infection resulting from Mycobacterium africanum, Mycobacterium canetti, Mycobacterium microti, Mycobacterium bovis, Mycobacterium bovis BCG. The subject of the present invention is also a method for detecting the sequences in question by the products of expression of these sequences and the kits for carrying out these methods. Finally, the subject of the present invention is novel vaccines.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61P 31/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/35 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/70 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/5695 (2013.01); C07K 14/35 (2013.01); C12Q 1/689 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1338657 A1 20030827; EP 1338657 B1 20070418; EP 1338657 B9 20071010; AT 360097 T 20070515; AT 403752 T 20080815; AU 2003208539 A1 20030909; AU 2003208539 B2 20081120; CA 2477195 A1 20030828; CA 2477195 C 20150106; DE 60219589 D1 20070531; DE 60219589 T2 20080214; DE 60322674 D1 20080918; DK 1338657 T3 20070730; EP 1478777 A2 20041124; EP 1478777 B1 20080806; ES 2286212 T3 20071201; JP 2005518203 A 20050623; JP 4738740 B2 20110803; PT 1338657 E 20070621; US 2006127897 A1 20060615; US 7977047 B2 20110712; WO 03070981 A2 20030828; WO 03070981 A3 20031204; WO 03070981 A8 20041007

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140903

2014-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140225

2014-10-23 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070401418

- Effective date: 20140903

2014-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-05-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20130118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080121

2007-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2286212 T3

2007-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-06-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401418

2007-06-21 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60219589 P 20070531

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2007-05-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI