EP 1339045 A1 20030827 - Method for pre-processing speech
Title (en)
Method for pre-processing speech
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Vorverarbeitung von Sprache
Title (fr)
Procédé pour le prétraitement de la parole
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 02004143 A 20020225
Abstract (en)
A method for pre-processing speech in particular for a method for recognizing speech is suggested in which likelihoods (Lj, LMtotal, L) for occurrences for speech elements (P1, ..., Pm) based on acoustic feature data (AFD) is suggested, wherein before deriving said likelihoods (Lj, LMtotal, L) parts of said acoustic feature data (AFD) being representative for frequency bands (F1, ..., FN) which are assumed to be distorted by an additive and band-limited noise signal (NS) are exchanged by exchange feature data (EFD) so as to generate modified acoustic feature data (MAFD), said exchange feature data (EFD) being representative for undisturbed and/or average speech. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G10L 19/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G10L 19/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 2001021905 A1 20010913 - BURNETT GREG C [US], et al
- [A] EP 0789349 A2 19970813 - CANON KK [JP]
Citation (examination)
- WO 02095730 A1 20021128 - UNIV BELFAST [GB], et al
- JI MING ET AL: "Union: a new approach for combining sub-band observations for noisy speech recognition", SPEECH COMMUNICATION,1-1-2001, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, vol. 34, no. 1-2, 1 January 2001 (2001-01-01), AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS, pages 41 - 55, XP002209287
- JANCOVIC P. ET AL: "COMBINING MULTI-BAND AND FREQUENCY-FILTERING TECHNIQUES FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION IN NOISY ENVIRONMENTS", TEXT, SPEECH AND DIALOGUE. INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, TSD.PROCEEDINGS,, no. 1902, 13 September 2000 (2000-09-13), BERLIN HEIDELBERG, pages 265 - 270, XP008006658
- JANCOVIC P.; MING J.: "Combining the union model and missing feature method to improve noise robustness in ASR", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], vol. 1, 13 May 2003 (2003-05-13), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, pages I-69 - I-72
- MACHO D.; NADEU C.: "ON THE INTERACTION BETWEEN TIME AND FREQUENCY FILTERING OF SPEECH PARAMETERS FOR ROBUST SPEECH RECOGNITION", PROC. ICSLP '98, 1 October 1998 (1998-10-01), pages 1487 - 1490, XP007000817
- NADEU C.; HERNANDO J.; GORRICHO M.: "ON THE DECORRELATION OF FILTER-BANK ENERGIES IN SPEECH RECOGNITION", 4TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY. EUROSPEECH '95. MADRID, SPAIN, SEPT. 18 - 21, 1995; [EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY. (EUROSPEECH)], vol. 2, 18 September 1995 (1995-09-18), MADRID : GRAFICAS BRENS, ES, pages 1381 - 1384, XP000854958
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02004143 A 20020225