Global Patent Index - EP 1340595 A3

EP 1340595 A3 2004-12-01 - Flat chisel

Title (en)

Flat chisel

Title (de)

Flachmeissel

Title (fr)

Burin plat

Publication

EP 1340595 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03003501 A

Priority

DE 10208627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1340595A2] The chisel (2) has a chisel head (3) with a main cutter (7) transverse to the chisel axis (x), front striking surface (10), rear striking surface, and at least one side surface connecting the striking surfaces. At least one of the cutters is made slightly concave, or convex, or angled, or corrugated. At least one side cutter may merge with the main cutter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1340595 A2 20030903; EP 1340595 A3 20041201; DE 10208627 A1 20030911; US 2003221685 A1 20031204

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-09-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO