Global Patent Index - EP 1341870 A4

EP 1341870 A4 2004-12-29 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SPHERICAL BLUE FLUORESCENT SUBSTANCE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SPHERICAL BLUE FLUORESCENT SUBSTANCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KUGELFÖRMIGEN, BLAU FLUORESZIERENDEN SUBSTANZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DESTINE A LA FABRICATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE FLUORESCENTE BLEUE SPHERIQUE

Publication

EP 1341870 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00983566 A

Priority

KR 0001476 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02064701A1] The present invention relates to a method for manufacturing spherical and highly crystalline BAM blue phosphor particles, that are close to a single crystal. According to the present invention, the sperical BAM blue particles that are preferable for embodying pictures on a very bright PDP screen can be obtained by mixing raw materials with fluxes to prepare a mixture, transferring the mixture into a closed reactor, and heat-treating the mixture under a reducing atmosphere containing nitrogen and hydrogen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 11/08; C09K 11/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/64 (2006.01); C09K 11/08 (2006.01); C09K 11/77 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/7734 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] CHEOL-HEE PARK ET.AL.: "Effects on aluminium fluoride on formation of BaMgAl10O17:Eu", ASIA DISPLAY 98, October 1998 (1998-10-01), pages 657 - 660, XP009038992
  • [X] S. EKAMBARAM, K.C. PATIL: "Synthesis and properties of Eu2+ activated blue phosphor", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, vol. 248, 1997, pages 7 - 12, XP002302997
  • [X] B.M.J. SMETS, J.G. VERLIJSDONK: "The luminescence properties od Eu2+ and Mn2+ doped barium hexaaluminates", MAT. RES. BULL., vol. 21, 1986, pages 1305 - 1310, XP002302998
  • [A] J.M.P.J. VERSTEGEN, A.L.N. STEVELS: "The relation between crystal structure and luminescence in beta-alumina and magnetoplumbite phases", JOURNAL OF LUMINESCENCE, vol. 9, 1974, pages 406 - 414, XP002303000
  • See also references of WO 02064701A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 02064701 A1 20020822; CN 100396755 C 20080625; CN 1434847 A 20030806; EP 1341870 A1 20030910; EP 1341870 A4 20041229; JP 2004518798 A 20040624; JP 3834290 B2 20061018

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140701

2008-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAEJOO ELECTRONIC MATERIALS CO., LTD.

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071022

2004-12-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09K 11/08 A

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09K 11/80 B

2004-06-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIM, GYUN-JOONG

2004-06-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KANG, MIN-SOO

2004-06-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KWON, TAE-HYUN

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030107

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR