Global Patent Index - EP 1342861 B1

EP 1342861 B1 2007-10-10 - Connection device

Title (en)

Connection device

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation

Publication

EP 1342861 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02005078 A

Priority

EP 02005078 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1342861A1] The fixture device for facade components (14) in a facade construction formed by support profiles (2) involves an upper part profile (6) with a screw channel for fixture to a support profile. The support profiles have first rows of holes (15) and the upper part profile on its side facing the support profile beneath the screw channel has a second row of holes (18) matched to the first row of holes. First fixture screw (10) with a self-cutting thread are screwable into the holes (15) of the support profile. In the screw cahnnel second fixture screws (11) can be screwed. The second fixture screws press a clamp strip (12) against the facade components (14) and the support profiles. The upper part profile comprises a first profile part (20) with a U-shaped accommodation channel (24), which has an accommodation device for a tool-lessly introduction of a second profile part (28), which contains the screw channel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/967 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0818 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0856 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1342861 A1 20030910; EP 1342861 B1 20071010; DE 50211040 D1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211040

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120306

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080117

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211040 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STABALUX GMBH

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020306

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI