Global Patent Index - EP 1344929 B1

EP 1344929 B1 2004-12-01 - Fuel injector for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injector for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Injecteur de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1344929 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03003081 A

Priority

DE 10210927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1344929A1] The fuel injection valve has an inner control chamber (42) whose pressure exerts a closing force on an inner valve needle (12) and an outer control chamber (55) whose pressure exerts a closing force on an outer valve needle (10). Both control chambers are connected to a high pressure fuel chamber (7) via a feed choke. A control valve has a valve control chamber connected to the inner and outer control chambers via chokes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/08; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 45/086 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 2200/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1344929 A1 20030917; EP 1344929 B1 20041201; DE 10210927 A1 20031002; JP 2003269282 A 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070213

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070213

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 3

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50300174 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE FR GB

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO