Global Patent Index - EP 1347128 B1

EP 1347128 B1 2007-10-31 - Lock with deadbolt actuatable by an electric motor by way of a reduction gearset or a cylinder

Title (en)

Lock with deadbolt actuatable by an electric motor by way of a reduction gearset or a cylinder

Title (de)

Schloss mit einem Riegel, der durch einen Zylinder oder elektromotorisch durch ein Untersetzungsgetriebe zu betätigen ist

Title (fr)

Serrure à pêne dormant, actionnable par un barillet ou par un motoréducteur électrique

Publication

EP 1347128 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03006183 A

Priority

IT BO20020130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1347128A2] A lock provided with a deadbolt (8) that can be actuated electrically by an electric motor (10) through a reduction gearset (12-16) and manually by a cylinder (82), the gearset comprising a gear (16) that is provided with elements (26, 27) for driving the deadbolt by successive turns of the lock and is adapted to actuate an element for blocking the deadbolt (75), at right angles to the direction of the sliding of the deadbolt, characterized in that the driving elements (26, 27) are actuated between a position in which they drive the deadbolt and a position in which they do not drive it by actuation means (39, 40) controlled by the cylinder (82). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/02 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 63/0017 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0024 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0084 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

EE ES FR GR IT PT

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV

EPO simple patent family

EP 1347128 A2 20030924; EP 1347128 A3 20050119; EP 1347128 B1 20071031; ES 2295478 T3 20080416; IT BO20020130 A1 20030919; IT BO20020130 D0 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160320

2017-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080400031

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-15 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E001858

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-10-27 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20140319

2013-04-30 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295478 T3

2008-02-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080400031

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): EE ES FR GR IT PT

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV

2005-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CISA S.P.A.

2005-11-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): EE ES FR GR IT PT

2005-10-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050622

- Countries: LT

2005-10-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050622

- Countries: LV

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK