EP 1348555 A1 20031001 - Ink cartridge
Title (en)
Ink cartridge
Title (de)
Tintenpatrone
Title (fr)
Cartouche d'encre
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2002090322 A 20020328
- JP 2002218192 A 20020726
- JP 2002225295 A 20020801
- JP 2002214079 A 20020723
Abstract (en)
An ink cartrudge (200) includes an ink-holding portion (310), a flexible film (302), and a sensor lever (303). The ink-holding portion has an indented surface portion and an opening portion. The flexible film (302) covers the opening portion of the ink-holding portion and is capable of deforming toward the indented surface portion in association with reduction in ink amount in the indented surface portion. The sensor lever (303) has two ends. One end serves as an ink residual amount detection point and is disposed to protrude upward above the indented surface portion in the ink-holding portion. The other end extends away from the ink-holding portion. The flexible film (302) presses the ink residual amount detection point of the sensor lever (303) when the flexible film deforms toward the indented surface portion. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/175 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/1752 (2013.01); B41J 2/17553 (2013.01); B41J 2/17566 (2013.01); B41J 2002/17516 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- JP H0360670 A 19910315 - BROTHER IND LTD
- JP H03505999 A 19911226
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5623290 A 19970422 - IIDA HIROSHI [JP], et al
- [X] US 5729256 A 19980317 - YAMANAKA AKIHIRO [JP], et al
- [PX] US 2002047882 A1 20020425 - KARLINSKI HAGGAI [IL], et al
- [A] EP 0834402 A2 19980408 - CANON KK [JP]
- [A] EP 0742102 A2 19961113 - LEXMARK INT INC [US]
- [A] US 4604633 A 19860805 - KIMURA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 198 (M - 1398) 19 April 1993 (1993-04-19)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 366 (M - 1636) 11 July 1994 (1994-07-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1348555 A1 20031001; EP 1348555 B1 20041229; AT E285901 T1 20050115; CN 1277682 C 20061004; CN 1410272 A 20030416; DE 60202437 D1 20050203; DE 60202437 T2 20051215; ES 2236414 T3 20050716; HK 1055278 A1 20040102
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02021656 A 20020927; AT 02021656 T 20020927; CN 02143986 A 20020930; DE 60202437 T 20020927; ES 02021656 T 20020927; HK 03107529 A 20031016