EP 1348636 A1 20031001 - Bottle for beverages with ergonomic grip
Title (en)
Bottle for beverages with ergonomic grip
Title (de)
Getränkeflasche mit ergonomischem Griff
Title (fr)
Bouteille pour boisson avec prise ergonomique
Publication
Application
Priority
IT MI20020164 U 20020327
Abstract (en)
A bottle (1) for beverages, comprising a grip region (2), and having the particularity that the grip region comprises at least two recesses (4) formed in diametrically opposite points of the cross-section of the bottle. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B65D 23/10 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B65D 23/102 (2013.01); B65D 2501/0036 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] GB 2330125 A 19990414 - ACQUA VERA SPA [IT]
- [X] WO 0189938 A1 20011129 - JIN JIANSONG [CN]
- [XA] US D447411 S 20010904 - LICHTMAN JEFF [US], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1348636 A1 20031001; IT MI20020164 U1 20030929; IT MI20020164 V0 20020327
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02026377 A 20021125; IT MI20020164 U 20020327