EP 1349651 A4 20060719 - CRYSTALLINE MULTINARY METAL OXIDE COMPOSITIONS, PROCESS FOR PREPARING AND PROCESSES FOR USING THE COMPOSITION
Title (en)
CRYSTALLINE MULTINARY METAL OXIDE COMPOSITIONS, PROCESS FOR PREPARING AND PROCESSES FOR USING THE COMPOSITION
Title (de)
KRISTALLINE MULTINÄRE METALLOXIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Title (fr)
COMPOSITIONS A PLUSIEURS OXYDES METALLIQUES CRISTALLINS ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATIONS ET D'UTILISATIONS DE CELLES-CI
Publication
Application
Priority
US 0035011 W 20001222
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO02051539A1] A new family of crystalline metal oxide compositions have been synthesized. These compositions are described by the empirical formula: AnMM'xMyOp where A is an alkali metal cation, ammonium ion and mixtures thereof, M is niobium or tantalum, M' is tungsten, molybdenum, or mixtures thereof. M" is vanadium, tantalum, niobium, titanium, tin indium, gallium, aluminum, bismuth, antimony, tellurium and mixtures thereof. M" is an optional metal. These compositions are characterized by having an x-ray diffraction pattern having at least one peak at a d spacing of about 3.9 ANGSTROM . A hydrothermal synthesis procedure as well as hybrocarbon conversion processes using the composition are also disclosed.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B01J 23/00 (2006.01); B01J 23/20 (2006.01); B01J 29/04 (2006.01); B01J 37/10 (2006.01); C01G 39/00 (2006.01); C01G 41/00 (2006.01); C07C 5/22 (2006.01); C07C 5/32 (2006.01); C07C 5/367 (2006.01); C07C 5/41 (2006.01); C07C 6/12 (2006.01); C10G 35/06 (2006.01); B01J 23/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B01J 23/002 (2013.01); B01J 23/20 (2013.01); B01J 29/04 (2013.01); B01J 37/10 (2013.01); C01G 39/006 (2013.01); C01G 41/006 (2013.01); C07C 5/2213 (2013.01); C07C 5/322 (2013.01); C07C 5/367 (2013.01); C07C 5/412 (2013.01); C07C 6/126 (2013.01); C10G 35/06 (2013.01); B01J 23/24 (2013.01); B01J 2523/00 (2013.01); C01P 2002/52 (2013.01); C01P 2002/72 (2013.01); C01P 2004/82 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/60 (2013.01); C01P 2006/80 (2013.01); C01P 2006/82 (2013.01); C07C 2521/02 (2013.01); C07C 2521/06 (2013.01); C07C 2523/04 (2013.01); C07C 2523/08 (2013.01); C07C 2523/14 (2013.01); C07C 2523/18 (2013.01); C07C 2523/20 (2013.01); C07C 2523/22 (2013.01); C07C 2523/28 (2013.01); C07C 2523/30 (2013.01); C07C 2527/057 (2013.01); Y02P 20/52 (2015.11)
Citation (search report)
- [X] JP 2000143244 A 20000523 - MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP
- [A] JP 2000026123 A 20000125 - MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 08 6 October 2000 (2000-10-06)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 04 31 August 2000 (2000-08-31)
- [A] UEDA W ET AL: "Selective oxidation of light alkanes over hydrothermally synthesized Mo-V-M-O (M=Al, Ga, Bi, Sb, and Te) oxide catalysts", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 200, no. 1-2, 28 August 2000 (2000-08-28), pages 135 - 143, XP004272455, ISSN: 0926-860X
- [DA] UEDA W ET AL: "Hydrothermal synthesis of Mo-V-M-O complex metal oxide catalysts active for partial oxidation of ethane", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS - CHEMCOM, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, 1999, pages 517 - 518, XP002229941, ISSN: 1359-7345
- See references of WO 02051539A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 02051539 A1 20020704; EP 1349651 A1 20031008; EP 1349651 A4 20060719
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0035011 W 20001222; EP 00991706 A 20001222