Global Patent Index - EP 1350603 A3

EP 1350603 A3 2007-10-17 - Fastener driving device

Title (en)

Fastener driving device

Title (de)

Eintreibgerät für Befestigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enfoncement d'éléments de fixation

Publication

EP 1350603 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03252175 A

Priority

  • US 36980202 P
  • US 36988402 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1350603A2] A fastener driving device (10) includes a housing containing a chamber (20) for storing compressed air a cylinder structure (34) disposed within the housing, a piston (26) movably disposed within the cylinder, a driver (33) connected to the piston, a main valve (38) cooperable with the cylinder structure and movable between an open position and a closed position. The main valve (38) in its open position allows air to move the piston through a drive stroke. The fastener driving device also includes a trigger valve (36) operable between first and second positions. The trigger valve in its first position communicates air pressure from the chamber (20) to the main valve (38) through a signal passageway (43) so as to retain the main valve in a closed position. The trigger valve in its second position allows the air to be exhausted to atmosphere through the signal passageway (43) to permit the main valve to open. The cylinder (34) and the signal passageway (43) comprise an integrally molded structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/00 (2006.01); B25C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/008 (2013.01); B25C 1/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1350603 A2 20031008; EP 1350603 A3 20071017

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080529

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080404

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BURKE, BRIAN C.

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CANLAS JR., PRUDENCIO S.

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIMONELLI, DAVID J.

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK