Global Patent Index - EP 1350832 A4

EP 1350832 A4 2004-12-01 - METHOD OF REFINING PETROLEUM

Title (en)

METHOD OF REFINING PETROLEUM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RAFFINATION VON ERDÖL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RAFFINEMENT DE PETROLE

Publication

EP 1350832 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01998614 A

Priority

  • JP 0110489 W
  • JP 2000366013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1350832A1] The oil refining method according to the present invention comprises the fractional distillation process 1 for distilling and separating the feed oil into the distillate M1 and the residue M2; the hydrorefining process 2 wherein at least a part of the distillate M1 is refined by hydrogenation and desulfurized thereby to obtain the hydrorefined oil M3; the solvent deasphalting process 3 wherein the residue M2 is deasphalted with a solvent thereby to obtain the deasphalted oil M4 as an extract and asphaltene (pitch) M5 as the residue; the hydrodemetalizating/desulfurizing process 4 wherein at least a part of the deasphalted oil M4 is demetalized and desulfurized by hydrogenation thereby to obtain the HDMS refined oil M6; and the first mixing process 5 wherein a part of the HDMS refined oil M6 and at least a part of the hydrorefined oil M3 are mixed thereby to produce oil products. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 67/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/16 (2006.01); C10G 67/04 (2006.01); C10G 67/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 67/16 (2013.01); C10G 65/16 (2013.01); C10G 2300/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1350832 A1 20031008; EP 1350832 A4 20041201; AU 2002222568 B2 20060831; AU 2256802 A 20020611; CN 100387690 C 20080514; CN 1487989 A 20040407; JP WO2002044307 A1 20040402; KR 100800286 B1 20080204; KR 20030053062 A 20030627; NZ 526112 A 20050225; PL 194242 B1 20070531; PL 362971 A1 20041102; RU 2270230 C2 20060220; SA 2032 B1 20080604; US 2004069685 A1 20040415; WO 0244307 A1 20020606

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120601

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-12-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI