EP 1351048 A4 20070228 - FLUOROMETRIC ANALYZER AND FLUOROMETRIC ANALYSIS
Title (en)
FLUOROMETRIC ANALYZER AND FLUOROMETRIC ANALYSIS
Title (de)
FLUOROMETRISCHES ANALYSEGERÄT UND FLUOROMETRISCHE ANALYSE
Title (fr)
ANALYSEUR FLUOROMETRIQUE ET ANALYSE FLUOROMETRIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 0110998 W 20011214
- JP 2000380327 A 20001214
- JP 2001022105 A 20010130
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0248693A1] A fluorometric analyzer for analyzing the behavior of fluorescent molecules, characterized in that the analyzer comprises a laser light source, a sample stage for supporting a substrate on which a sample containing fluorescent molecules is placed, an optical system for focusing the light beam from the laser light source onto the sample to form a confocal region, a scanning mechanism for scanning the confocal region of the sample, an optical system for focusing the fluorescence from the sample, a photodetector for measuring the intensity of the focused fluorescence, and a fluorescence intensity recording means for recording the variation of the intensity of the fluorescence measured by the photodetector, the confocal region of the sample on the substrate is scanned by the scanning mechanism, the confocal region is defined near the region where the intensity of the fluorescence recorded by the fluorescence intensity recording means is maximum, the fluorescent molecules in the sample are irradiated with a laser beam after the sample is irradiated with the light beam for a predetermined time, the intensity of the fluorescence from the excited fluorescent molecules is measured, and analysis data on the fluorescent molecules is thus collected.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 15/14 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G01N 21/6402 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 21/6428 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 21/6452 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 21/6458 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 15/1433 (2024.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] WO 0043753 A1 20000727 - UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]
- [Y] WO 9947964 A1 19990923 - GENETIC MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al
- [Y] WO 8203918 A1 19821111 - FOLESTAD SVEN STAFFAN, et al
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 018 (P - 1673) 12 January 1994 (1994-01-12)
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)
- [DY] ROBERT M. DICKSON ET AL.: "On/Off blinking and switching behaviour of single molecules of green fluorescent protein", NATURE, vol. 388, 24 July 1997 (1997-07-24), pages 355 - 358, XP002400700
- [DY] WOLFGANG WEBER ET AL.: "Shedding light on the dark and weakly fluorescent states of green fluorescent proteins", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, vol. 96, 1 May 1999 (1999-05-01), pages 6177 - 6182, XP002400701
- [A] V. HELMS ET AL.: "Low-lying electronic excitations of the green fluorescent protein chromophore", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR STRUCTURE (THEOCHEM), vol. 506, 2000, pages 179 - 189, XP002400702
- See also references of WO 0248693A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0248693 A1 20020620; EP 1351048 A1 20031008; EP 1351048 A4 20070228; JP 3999662 B2 20071031; JP WO2002048693 A1 20040415; US 2004051051 A1 20040318
DOCDB simple family (application)
JP 0110998 W 20011214; EP 01270763 A 20011214; JP 2002549951 A 20011214; US 46084503 A 20030613