Global Patent Index - EP 1354678 A3

EP 1354678 A3 2007-10-17 - Separating mechanism in an apparatus for the gluing of wood blocks

Title (en)

Separating mechanism in an apparatus for the gluing of wood blocks

Title (de)

Trennmechanismus in einer Vorrichtung zum Verkleben von Holzklötzen

Title (fr)

Appareil de séparation dans un dispositif pour coller de billes de bois

Publication

EP 1354678 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03075879 A

Priority

FI 20020725 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1354678A2] A separating mechanism in a gluing apparatus for the gluing of elongated wood blocks (1), said gluing apparatus comprising an adhesive application unit for the application of adhesive at least to one of the surfaces (1a, 1b) to be glued and a pressing mechanism (11, 12) for pressing together the surfaces to be glued, and said separating mechanism comprising a frame part and separating elements for keeping the wood blocks (1) clear of each other before the pressing. The separating mechanism of the invention comprises a vertical frame part (3) provided with supporters (4) functioning as separating elements, arranged one above the other at least on one side of the frame part, on which supporters the wood blocks can be arranged, and which frame part can be moved in vertical and horizontal directions by an operating mechanism, and a stopper arrangement for stopping the wood blocks (1) and arranging them so that the surfaces to be glued are set against each other in order to be pressed together.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27G 11/00 (2006.01); B27M 1/00 (2006.01); B27M 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 1/08 (2013.01); B27G 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1354678 A2 20031022; EP 1354678 A3 20071017; CA 2425394 A1 20031015; FI 116205 B 20051014; FI 20020725 A0 20020415; FI 20020725 A 20031016

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-08-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B27G 11/00 20060101AFI20030603BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B27M 1/00 20060101ALI20070911BHEP

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK