Global Patent Index - EP 1356161 B8

EP 1356161 B8 2009-02-18 - FOAM TREATMENT OF TISSUE PRODUCTS

Title (en)

FOAM TREATMENT OF TISSUE PRODUCTS

Title (de)

SCHAUMBEHANDLUNG VON TISSUEPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT PAR MOUSSE DE PRODUITS EN PAPIER-LINGE

Publication

EP 1356161 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 01990039 A

Priority

  • US 0147462 W
  • US 24677100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0238865A2] A method for applying a foam to a paper web is provided. Specifically, a foam is first formed from a liquid-based composition and a gas, such as air. Once formed, the foam is applied by a foam applicator to the web. In one embodiment, for example, the foam applicator applies the foam without substantially contacting the web. When applied with the foam, the web typically has a solids consistency less than about 95% by weight of the web. In some embodiments, one or more vacuum slots can be utilized in conjunction with the foam applicator to facilitate uniform application of the foam to the paper web.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/56 (2006.01); D21H 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/56 (2013.01); D21H 23/26 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249987 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0238865 A2 20020516; WO 0238865 A3 20030515; AU 2002228914 B2 20060504; AU 2891402 A 20020521; BR 0115032 A 20060131; BR 0115032 B1 20120110; CA 2423827 A1 20020516; CA 2423827 C 20100727; DE 60136742 D1 20090108; EP 1356161 A2 20031029; EP 1356161 B1 20081126; EP 1356161 B8 20090218; KR 100816630 B1 20080324; KR 20030064781 A 20030802; MX PA03003836 A 20030728; US 2002092635 A1 20020718; US 6852196 B2 20050208

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141108

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141108

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141108

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121206

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60136742

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60136742

- Effective date: 20110601

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136742 P 20090108

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060331

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI