Global Patent Index - EP 1357289 B1

EP 1357289 B1 2009-02-18 - High pressure cleaner with remote safety controller

Title (en)

High pressure cleaner with remote safety controller

Title (de)

Sicherheitsfernsteuerung für den Betrieb von Hochdruckreinigern

Title (fr)

Unité de contrôle télécommandé pour nettoyeur haute pression

Publication

EP 1357289 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03006613 A

Priority

DE 10218143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1357289A2] The safety remote control has safety circuit (6) that switches the motor (9) of the high pressure pump (15) on and off, whereby the safety circuit itself is switched on by a signal directly triggered by the spray lance (2) and is switched off as soon as non high pressure is taken. The signal to switch off the safety circuit is cut off by a pressure monitor using a cut-off contact (5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1357289 A2 20031029; EP 1357289 A3 20031217; EP 1357289 B1 20090218; DE 10218143 A1 20031113; DE 50311180 D1 20090402

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50311180 P 20090402

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK