Global Patent Index - EP 1358959 B8

EP 1358959 B8 2009-02-25 - Casting apparatus and molten metal feed apparatus

Title (en)

Casting apparatus and molten metal feed apparatus

Title (de)

Giessvorrichtung und Vorrichtung zur Zufuhr von Metallschmelze

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coulage et dispositif pour l'aménée de métal en fusion

Publication

EP 1358959 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 03009284 A

Priority

JP 2002127071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1358959A1] A molten metal feed apparatus which can feed molten metal into a casting apparatus by opening a vessel and which is free from leakage of the molten metal from the opening/closing part of the vessel, provided with a holding vessel having an opening at its bottom and holding a metal material, a lid for closing the opening, a drive means for making the lid move with respect to the holding vessel to open or close the opening, and an induction heating coil for heating the metal material by induction of a current to the metal material in the holding vessel and generating a magnetic field applying to the molten metal a force preventing leakage of the molten metal in the holding vessel from between the opening and the lid. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 37/00 (2006.01); H05B 6/24 (2006.01); B22D 17/28 (2006.01); B22D 17/30 (2006.01); B22D 39/00 (2006.01); B22D 41/00 (2006.01); B22D 41/015 (2006.01); C22B 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/30 (2013.01); B22D 17/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1358959 A1 20031105; EP 1358959 B1 20081126; EP 1358959 B8 20090225; CN 1268457 C 20060809; CN 1454736 A 20031112; DE 60324857 D1 20090108; JP 2003320446 A 20031111; JP 3987373 B2 20071010; KR 20030084750 A 20031101; US 2003201090 A1 20031030; US 6910521 B2 20050628

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150424

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60324857

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140416

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60324857 P 20090108

2008-12-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TOSHIBA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2008-11-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TOSHIBA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Free text: TOSHIBA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#2-11, 4-CHOME GINZA, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 104-0061 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- TOSHIBA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#2-2 UCHISAIWAICHO 2-CHOME CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 100 8503 (JP)

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050718

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040308

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK