EP 1359258 A1 20031105 - Pile foot reamer
Title (en)
Pile foot reamer
Title (de)
Pfahlfuss-Schneidvorrichtung
Title (fr)
Dispositif de coupe pour élargir le pied d'un pieu
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10219759 A 20020502
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a pile foot cutting device for a substantially radial extension of a foot region of a pile bore. The cutting device comprises a cylindrical body and cutting blades, which are constructed as cylinder shell segments of the cylindrical body. The cutting blades are pivotably provided on the body and can be swung laterally therefrom with a predeterminable blade angle.
Abstract (de)
Die Erfindung betrifft eine Pfahlfuß-Schneidvorrichtung zur im Wesentlichen radialen Erweiterung eines Fußbereiches einer Pfahlbohrung. Die Schneidvorrichtung umfasst einen zylindrischen Grundkörper (12) und Schneidflügel (14), welche als Zylinderschalensegmente des zylindrischen Grundkörpers ausgebildet sind. Die Schneidflügel sind schwenkbar am Grundkörper und seitlich aus diesem mit vorgebbarem Ausstellwinkel ausklappbar. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
E02D 5/44 (2006.01); E21B 10/32 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
E02D 5/44 (2013.01 - EP); E21B 10/322 (2013.01 - EP US); E21B 10/327 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 12 31 October 1998 (1998-10-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 05 30 May 1997 (1997-05-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 578 (M - 1346) 17 December 1992 (1992-12-17)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1359258 A1 20031105; EP 1359258 B1 20070117; DE 10219759 B3 20040212; HK 1056902 A1 20040305; ZA 200302485 B 20030708
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03006237 A 20030320; DE 10219759 A 20020502; HK 03108754 A 20031201; ZA 200302485 A 20030331