Global Patent Index - EP 1359381 A3

EP 1359381 A3 2004-12-22 - Modular refrigerated cabinet

Title (en)

Modular refrigerated cabinet

Title (de)

Modulare Kühlmöbel-Anordnung

Title (fr)

Meuble frigorifique modulaire

Publication

EP 1359381 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03007552 A

Priority

DE 10219101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1359381A2] Modular parts of about 1.25 meters are used to make longer cool cabinets of the same type with choice of cladding, head and base panels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/06; A47F 3/00; A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/04 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/062 (2013.01); A47F 3/004 (2013.01); A47F 3/04 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1359381 A2 20031105; EP 1359381 A3 20041222; DE 10219101 A1 20031106

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081101

2006-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 25D 23/06 A

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47F 3/00 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47F 3/04 B

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH & CO.KG

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO