EP 1361447 A3 20040107 - Externally controllable electronic test system and corresponding method
Title (en)
Externally controllable electronic test system and corresponding method
Title (de)
Extern ansteuerbares elektronisches Prüfsystem und dazugehöriges Verfahren
Title (fr)
Système de test électronique contrôlable de façon externe et méthode correspondante
Publication
Application
Priority
US 14171702 A 20020509
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1361447A2] A test executive system (100) for performing tests on an electronic device (108). The system includes an electronic test program (800) that provides plug-ins (140) to allow communication with other electronic devices (141, 143, 149). The electronic test program also provides an Active X-COM interface (825) that allows the other electronic programs to control the test executive program (810). The interface devices can be selected and deselected using a drop down menu (400) in a GUI (300). <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01R 19/25 (2006.01); G01R 31/28 (2006.01); G01R 31/319 (2006.01); G06F 11/22 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
G01R 19/2516 (2013.01 - EP US); G01R 31/2834 (2013.01 - EP US); G01R 31/31912 (2013.01 - EP US); G06F 11/22 (2013.01 - KR)
Citation (search report)
- [E] EP 1314989 A2 20030528 - AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]
- [X] WO 9947937 A2 19990923 - TERADYNE INC [US]
- [X] "LABVIEW USER MANUAL", November 2001, NATIONAL INSTRUMENT, XP002260913
- [X] BUTLER H: "VIRTUAL REMOTE: THE CENTRALIZED EXPERT", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, HEWLETT-PACKARD CO. PALO ALTO, US, vol. 45, no. 5, 1 October 1994 (1994-10-01), pages 75 - 82, XP000471161
- [X] FERTITTA K G ET AL: "The role of ACTIVEX and COM in ATE", AUTOTESTCON '99. IEEE SYSTEMS READINESS TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999. IEEE SAN ANTONIO, TX, USA 30 AUG.-2 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, 30 August 1999 (1999-08-30), pages 35 - 51, XP010356128, ISBN: 0-7803-5432-X
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1361447 A2 20031112; EP 1361447 A3 20040107; JP 2003330750 A 20031121; KR 20030087933 A 20031115; TW 200306429 A 20031116; US 2003212522 A1 20031113; US 7286951 B2 20071023
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03251887 A 20030326; JP 2003111014 A 20030416; KR 20030028769 A 20030507; TW 91135481 A 20021206; US 14171702 A 20020509