Global Patent Index - EP 1362672 A3

EP 1362672 A3 2007-10-31 - Device for holding and fastening of screws

Title (en)

Device for holding and fastening of screws

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Halten und Eindrehen von Schrauben

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tenir et visser des vis

Publication

EP 1362672 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02026716 A

Priority

DE 10222230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10222230C1] The head for a screwdriver (20) has a radially extending head (23) with a central recess (24) for form locking to the screw to be driven by a bit (3). A holder (4) for the screw head has a annular channels (9) for sprung balls (8) to releasably hold the screw. The head has an abutment (11) radially outside the bit to form an engagement surface for the screw which is retained by the balls.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/10 (2006.01); B25B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/0064 (2013.01); B25B 15/001 (2013.01); B25B 23/10 (2013.01); B25B 23/101 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

DE 10222230 C1 20030731; EP 1362672 A2 20031119; EP 1362672 A3 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080503

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI