Global Patent Index - EP 1362740 B1

EP 1362740 B1 2009-02-25 - Vehicle lamp

Title (en)

Vehicle lamp

Title (de)

Fahrzeugleuchte

Title (fr)

Feu de véhicule

Publication

EP 1362740 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03101294 A

Priority

DE 10221683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1362740A2] Luminous diodes (2,2') each fit on diode bases (4) for integrating electrical connections and have their optical axes set at a deflecting angle aligned as a right angle to a main beam direction (6) for main reflectors (3) with a partially paraboloid surface. Adjacent reflectors allocated to each luminous diode act as subsidiary reflectors (SR) (3') to allow the diodes to light up SR edges.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/06 (2006.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 43/30 (2018.01); F21S 43/14 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1362740 A2 20031119; EP 1362740 A3 20061227; EP 1362740 B1 20090225; DE 10221683 A1 20031204; DE 50311205 D1 20090409

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-10 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50311205

2017-12-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HELLA GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HELLA KG HUECK & CO., 59557 LIPPSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 50311205

2017-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50311205

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FIEDLER, OSTERMANN & SCHNEIDER, DE

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50311205 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUENSCHEDE, ELMAR

2007-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070605

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60Q 1/00 20060101AFI20030718BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 7/00 20060101ALI20061123BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 7/06 20060101ALI20061123BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21Y 101/02 20060101ALN20061123BHEP

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK