Global Patent Index - EP 1365473 A4

EP 1365473 A4 2004-12-15 - REFLECTOR ANTENNA

Title (en)

REFLECTOR ANTENNA

Title (de)

REFLEKTORANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A REFLECTEUR

Publication

EP 1365473 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02701640 A

Priority

  • JP 0201863 W
  • JP 2001058811 A
  • JP 0106236 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02071538A1] A reflector antenna which can be installed in a limited space, has sufficient practicability and performs scanning while turning about two orthogonal axes, and which comprises a Cassegrain reflector and a rotary mechanism for turning it about the azimuth axis and the elevation axis. The reflector having a substantially rectangular aperture is subjected to figuring such that its elevation axis passes through substantially the center of the height dimension of the reflector, supplied electromagnetic wave is received and reflected substantially entirely, and the antenna height does not increase even when the reflector turns about the elevation axis. The reflector may be an array of a plurality of reflector elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/20; H01Q 1/28; H01Q 3/08; H01Q 19/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/08 (2006.01); H01Q 3/20 (2006.01); H01Q 19/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/20 (2013.01); H01Q 3/08 (2013.01); H01Q 19/19 (2013.01); H01Q 19/193 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 02071538 A1 20020912; EP 1365473 A1 20031126; EP 1365473 A4 20041215; EP 1365473 B1 20050706

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-01 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20090305

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60204946 P 20050811

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 3/20 A

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 3/08 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 19/19 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 1/28 B

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR