Global Patent Index - EP 1367463 A3

EP 1367463 A3 2007-10-03 - Timepiece

Title (en)

Timepiece

Title (de)

Uhr

Title (fr)

Montre

Publication

EP 1367463 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03011311 A

Priority

DE 20208525 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1367463A2] A clock date change mechanism has a date drive train (21) with day change wheel (27) released by the date drive lever (28) moving out of the way of a radial stop (29) on a cam disc (10) driven by a drive train (22) from the clock or separate spiral spring drive (26) fixed between housing and spring shaft.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/24 (2006.01); G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/241 (2013.01); G04B 19/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

DE 20208525 U1 20031016; AT 462160 T 20100415; DE 50312542 D1 20100506; EP 1367463 A2 20031203; EP 1367463 A3 20071003; EP 1367463 B1 20100324; JP 2004004094 A 20040108; JP 4221246 B2 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100324

2011-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101228

2010-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50312542 P 20100506

2010-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2008-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080207

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK