Global Patent Index - EP 1368814 B1

EP 1368814 B1 2009-02-25 - ACTUATOR

Title (en)

ACTUATOR

Title (de)

AKTUATOR

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR

Publication

EP 1368814 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02748309 A

Priority

  • DE 0200752 W
  • DE 10110342 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02071421A2] A prior art actuator has a ferromagnetic circuit consisting of three parts. In addition, realizing an armature travel with a constantly high magnetic force over large travels requires a high degree of complexity. In contrast, an inventive actuator (1) comprises two parts in the ferromagnetic circuit and has a simple structure. A magnetic return element (3) has an offset (90), which influences the magnetic flux direction (60) according to the position of an armature (9), whereby achieving a constantly high magnetic force over the entire travel and thus obtaining a flat magnetic force-travel course.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1607 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 02071421 A2 20020912; WO 02071421 A3 20030424; DE 10110342 A1 20020912; DE 50213315 D1 20090409; EP 1368814 A2 20031210; EP 1368814 B1 20090225; JP 2004519109 A 20040624; JP 4130773 B2 20080806; US 2003155839 A1 20030821; US 6919786 B2 20050719

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213315

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213315 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2007-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070821

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRIMMER, ERWIN

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHULZ, WOLFGANG

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LORENZ, CHRISTIAN

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRENDLE, MATTHIAS

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR