EP 1370138 A4 20040818 - GENE THERAPY FOR NEUROLOGICAL TISSUES
Title (en)
GENE THERAPY FOR NEUROLOGICAL TISSUES
Title (de)
GENTHERAPIE FÜR NERVENGEWEBE
Title (fr)
THERAPIE GENIQUE POUR TISSUS NEUROLOGIQUES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0205886 W 20020228
- US 79877501 A 20010302
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO02069711A1] Provided is a method of delivering to neurological tissue a transforming composition or a transformed cell, the method comprising; injecting a physiologically acceptable cerebrospinal perfusion fluid into a first catheter into the cerebrospinal pathway, which cerebrospinal perfusion fluid has a gene therapy effective amount of gene therapy agent or transformed cells; withdrawing fluid at a second catheter into the cerebrospinal pathway to create a flow and flow pathway between the first and second catheters; and maintaining the flow for a period of time adapted to perfuse at least 1 CSF volume.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A61K 48/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 48/00 (2013.01); A61P 3/00 (2017.12); A61P 21/00 (2017.12); A61P 25/00 (2017.12)
Citation (search report)
- [XP] WO 0205870 A2 20020124 - NEURON THERAPEUTICS INC [US]
- [X] KORDOWER JEFFREY H ET AL: "Neurodegeneration prevented by lentiviral vector delivery of GDNF in primate models of Parkinson's disease", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 290, no. 5492, 2000, pages 767 - 773, XP002207711, ISSN: 0036-8075
- [Y] ERIKSDOTTER JÖNHAGEN M ET AL: "Intracerebroventricular infusion of nerve growth factor in three patients with Alzheimer's disease.", DEMENTIA AND GERIATRIC COGNITIVE DISORDERS. SWITZERLAND 1998 SEP-OCT, vol. 9, no. 5, September 1998 (1998-09-01), pages 246 - 257, XP002284731, ISSN: 1420-8008
- [Y] BACHOUD-LEVI A -C ET AL: "Neuroprotective gene therapy for Huntington's disease using a polymer encapsulated BHK cell line engineered to secrete human CNTF", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, vol. 11, no. 12, 10 August 2000 (2000-08-10), pages 1723 - 1729, XP002284732, ISSN: 1043-0342
- [Y] BOSE B ET AL: "Preservation of neuronal function during prolonged focal cerebral ischemia by ventriculocisternal perfusion with oxygenated fluorocarbon emulsion.", NEUROSURGERY. UNITED STATES MAR 1986, vol. 18, no. 3, March 1986 (1986-03-01), pages 270 - 276, XP009032314, ISSN: 0148-396X
- [Y] MCINNES RODERICK R ET AL: "Neural stem cells: A versatile tool for cell replacement and gene therapy in the central nervous system", CLINICAL GENETICS, vol. 56, no. 4, October 1999 (1999-10-01), pages 267 - 278, XP002284734, ISSN: 0009-9163
- [YP] AEBISCHER P ET AL: "Recombinant proteins for neurodegenerative diseases: the delivery issue", TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 24, no. 9, 1 September 2001 (2001-09-01), pages 533 - 540, XP004298585, ISSN: 0166-2236
- See references of WO 02069711A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 02069711 A1 20020912; EP 1370138 A1 20031217; EP 1370138 A4 20040818
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0205886 W 20020228; EP 02713697 A 20020228